There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution to acquire land for watershed protection at the Smithsonian Environmental Research Center, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/17/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept.102-456, Part I.
06/25/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date
03/17/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept.102-456, Part I.
02/05/1992Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/05/1992Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
11/13/1991Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/13/1991Ordered to be Reported.
11/01/1991Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials
11/01/1991Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials
10/09/1991Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
10/09/1991Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
08/01/1991Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds Prior to Referral (Jun 26, 91).
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
08/01/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
07/18/1991Rereferred jointly to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/1991Rereferred jointly to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/18/1991-10:13amMr. Rose asked unanimous consent that the bill, H.R. 2757, be rereferred to the Committee on House Administration and the Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/27/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
06/25/1991Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. (Referral Suspended).
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1]* 06/25/1991
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 06/25/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration06/25/1991 Referred to
07/18/1991 Re-Referred to
11/13/1991 Markup by
House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials06/27/1991 Referred to
11/01/1991 Markup by
11/01/1991 Reported by
House Public Works and Transportation07/18/1991 Re-Referred to
02/05/1992 Markup by
03/17/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-456 Part 1
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds08/01/1991 Referred to
08/01/1991 Hearings by
10/09/1991 Markup by
10/09/1991 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2757. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (03/17/1992)

Authorizes the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution to acquire land for watershed protection at the Smithsonian Environmental Research Center at Edgewater, Maryland. Authorizes appropriations to the Board to carry out such purposes for FY 1993 and 1994. Requires that such sums be matched equally with funds from non-Federal sources.

Amends Federal law which authorizes the Board to plan, design, construct, and equip specified space in the National Museum of Natural History to provide that the appropriation authorized for such purpose is to remain available until expended.