Committees: H.R.2757 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration06/25/1991 Referred to
07/18/1991 Re-Referred to
11/13/1991 Markup by
House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials06/27/1991 Referred to
11/01/1991 Markup by
11/01/1991 Reported by
House Public Works and Transportation07/18/1991 Re-Referred to
02/05/1992 Markup by
03/17/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-456 Part 1
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds08/01/1991 Referred to
08/01/1991 Hearings by
10/09/1991 Markup by
10/09/1991 Reported by