There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Geologic Mapping Act of 1992

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Geologic Mapping Act of 1992

Short Titles as Introduced

National Geologic Mapping Act of 1991

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Geologic Mapping Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance geologic mapping of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
05/18/1992Became Public Law No: 102-285.
05/18/1992Signed by President.
05/06/1992Presented to President.
04/30/1992Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.
03/31/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
03/31/1992Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/19/1991Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/19/1991Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 102-333.
06/25/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (32)

Date Chamber
05/18/1992Became Public Law No: 102-285.
05/18/1992Signed by President.
05/06/1992HousePresented to President.
04/30/1992SenateMessage on House action received in Senate.
04/30/1992-4:37pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/30/1992-4:37pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.
04/30/1992-4:37pmHouseMr. Rahall asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendments.
04/01/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/31/1992SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
03/31/1992SenateS.Amdt.1751 Amendment SP 1751 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
03/31/1992SenateAmendment SP 1751 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
03/31/1992SenateS.Amdt.1751 Proposed by Senator Lautenberg for Senator Johnston. Of a perfecting nature.
03/31/1992SenateAmendment SP 1751 proposed by Senator Lautenberg for Senator Johnston.
03/31/1992SenateMeasure laid before Senate.
03/31/1992SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/22/1991SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Mineral Resources Development.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
11/21/1991SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/19/1991-11:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/19/1991-11:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/19/1991-11:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
11/19/1991-11:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
11/19/1991-11:20pmHouseMr. Rahall moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/19/1991HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
11/19/1991HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 102-333.
11/13/1991HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
11/13/1991HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/07/1991HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Mining and Natural Resources
11/07/1991HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Mining and Natural Resources
07/25/1991HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Mining and Natural Resources
07/16/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Mining and Natural Resources.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
06/25/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
06/25/1991HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/25/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 06/25/1991
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 06/25/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/30/1991
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/30/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/30/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/30/1991
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/30/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/30/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/02/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/11/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/11/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 09/11/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 09/11/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 09/11/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/11/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/24/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 09/24/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/24/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/26/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/26/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/26/1991
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/03/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/03/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/03/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 10/03/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/03/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 10/08/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/08/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 10/10/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 10/10/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/22/1991
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 10/22/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/22/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/22/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 10/29/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 10/29/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 11/06/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 11/12/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 11/12/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 11/18/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 11/18/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 11/19/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 11/19/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs06/25/1991 Referred to
11/13/1991 Markup by
11/19/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-333
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Mining and Natural Resources07/16/1991 Referred to
07/25/1991 Hearings by
11/07/1991 Markup by
11/07/1991 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/21/1991 Referred to
03/31/1992 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Mineral Resources Development and Production11/22/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2763. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (03/31/1992)

National Geologic Mapping Act of 1992 - Establishes in the U.S. Geological Survey (USGS) the National Cooperative Geologic Mapping Program. Sets forth program objectives.

Requires that the program include Federal, support, State, and education geologic mapping components. Sets forth objectives for each component, including the support component contributing to national paleontologic, geochronologic, geophysical-map, and geochemical-map data bases.

Establishes an advisory committee.

Mandates preparation of an implementation plan for the program covering specified matters.

Establishes a national geologic-map data base to be a national archive that includes all maps and data bases developed under this Act. Declares that geologic maps contributed to the national archives should be standardized so that information can be assimilated, exchanged, and compared efficiently and accurately.

Authorizes appropriations for each component.

Designates: (1) the Geological Survey established by specified Federal law as the United States Geological Survey; and (2) the Bureau of Mines established by specified Federal law as the United States Bureau of Mines.