Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/22/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 10/22/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 01/28/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/28/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/28/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 01/28/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 01/28/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/05/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/05/1992
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/05/1992
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 02/05/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/05/1992
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1] 03/04/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/04/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 03/04/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/04/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/04/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/04/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/04/1992
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 03/04/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/04/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/04/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 03/11/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/11/1992
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/11/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/11/1992
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 03/11/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/11/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 03/11/1992
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 03/12/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 03/12/1992
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 03/12/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/12/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/12/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 03/12/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/12/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/12/1992
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/12/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/12/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/18/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/18/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/18/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/18/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/18/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/18/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/18/1992
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 03/18/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/18/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/18/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 03/18/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/18/1992
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/18/1992
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 03/18/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/24/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 03/24/1992
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/24/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/24/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/24/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/24/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/24/1992
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 03/24/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/24/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/25/1992
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 03/25/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/25/1992
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 03/25/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/25/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/25/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/25/1992
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 03/31/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/31/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 03/31/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 03/31/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 03/31/1992
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/31/1992
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 03/31/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/31/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/31/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/31/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/31/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/31/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 04/01/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 04/01/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 04/01/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/01/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/01/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/01/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/01/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 04/01/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/01/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/01/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/01/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/01/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/08/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 04/08/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/08/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/08/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/08/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 04/08/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/08/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/08/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/08/1992
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 04/08/1992
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/08/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/08/1992
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 04/09/1992
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/09/1992
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/09/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/09/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/09/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/28/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/28/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/28/1992
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/28/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/28/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 04/28/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 04/28/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/30/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/30/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/30/1992
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/30/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/30/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/30/1992
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/30/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/12/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/12/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/19/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/19/1992
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 05/19/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 05/19/1992
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/27/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 05/27/1992
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 05/27/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/27/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/27/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/03/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/03/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/03/1992
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/03/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/09/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/09/1992
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 06/09/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/09/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 06/17/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/17/1992
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/17/1992
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 06/17/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/17/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/17/1992
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/25/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/25/1992
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 06/25/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 06/29/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/29/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/30/1992