Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 06/27/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/17/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 07/17/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 07/17/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/17/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/17/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 07/17/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/17/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/17/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/17/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/17/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/17/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 07/17/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 07/17/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/02/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 08/02/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 08/02/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 08/02/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/08/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/08/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 10/08/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 10/22/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 10/22/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 10/22/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 10/22/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/22/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 10/22/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 11/12/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 11/12/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/12/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/12/1991
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 11/12/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/12/1991
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 11/12/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/12/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/12/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 11/12/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/12/1991
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 11/12/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 11/25/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 11/25/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/25/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/25/1991
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/25/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 11/25/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 01/28/1992
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 01/28/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 01/28/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 01/28/1992
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/05/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/05/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/05/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/28/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 05/28/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/05/1992