There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to determine whether individuals entitled to benefits under the medicare program meet the requirements for status as qualified medicare beneficiaries under the medicaid program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/10/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
07/26/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/16/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/10/1991Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/1991Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/10/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/17/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/17/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/17/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/17/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/17/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/17/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/17/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/17/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/23/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/23/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/23/1991
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/23/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 07/23/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/23/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 07/23/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/23/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/23/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/23/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/23/1991
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 07/23/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/23/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/23/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/31/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 07/31/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/31/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/31/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 08/02/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/16/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/16/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 09/16/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/16/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/16/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 09/16/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 09/16/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/09/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/07/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/29/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/29/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/29/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/12/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/12/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/10/1991 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment07/26/1991 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/10/1991 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health07/16/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2855.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2855. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/10/1991)

Amends part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to determine whether an individual entitled to benefits under part A (Hospital Insurance) meets the requirements for status as a qualified Medicare beneficiary under the Medicaid program (title XIX of the Social Security Act).