Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/24/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/24/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/24/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 07/24/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 07/26/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/26/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/26/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/26/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/31/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/31/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/31/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/11/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/11/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 09/11/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/11/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/11/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 09/11/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/11/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/11/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/11/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/11/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/11/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 09/17/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 09/17/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 09/19/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/19/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 09/24/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/26/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/01/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 10/01/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/03/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/07/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/09/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/09/1991
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 10/10/1991
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/10/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/16/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/16/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 10/17/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/17/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/21/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/21/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 10/21/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/23/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 10/23/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 10/29/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/29/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 10/29/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 11/05/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 11/05/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/05/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 11/05/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 11/21/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 11/21/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 11/21/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/21/1991
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 11/21/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/21/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/21/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 11/23/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 11/23/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 01/28/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 01/29/1992
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/04/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 02/05/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/07/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/19/1992
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 02/19/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/19/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/19/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 03/09/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 03/10/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 03/10/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/12/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/18/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/18/1992
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/20/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/20/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/24/1992
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 03/24/1992
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 03/25/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 04/29/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/29/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/29/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/29/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 05/06/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/13/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/13/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/13/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/27/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/27/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/09/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/09/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 07/08/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 07/09/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 07/21/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 07/21/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 07/22/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/22/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 07/27/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/27/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 07/30/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/09/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/09/1992
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/16/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew