Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 07/11/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/11/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/23/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 07/23/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/23/1991
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 07/23/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 07/23/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/23/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/23/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/23/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 07/23/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/23/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/23/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/23/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/24/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/24/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/24/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 07/24/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/25/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 07/25/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/25/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/25/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/25/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/25/1991
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 07/30/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/30/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/30/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 07/30/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/30/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/30/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/30/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/30/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/30/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/30/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 08/02/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 08/02/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 08/02/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 08/02/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 08/02/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 08/02/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 08/02/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/02/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 09/11/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 09/11/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/11/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 09/11/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/11/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 09/11/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 09/11/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/11/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/11/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/11/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/11/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/11/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/11/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/11/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/11/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/11/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 09/17/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 09/17/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/17/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/17/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 09/23/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/23/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/23/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 10/01/1991
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 10/01/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 10/01/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/01/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/03/1991
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/03/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/15/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/15/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/15/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/15/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/22/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 10/22/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/22/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/22/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/22/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/22/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/29/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 10/29/1991
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/29/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/29/1991
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 11/04/1991
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 11/04/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/04/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/04/1991
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 11/12/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/12/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 11/12/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/12/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 11/12/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 11/21/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 11/21/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/21/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/21/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/21/1991
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/21/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/26/1991
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 11/26/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 11/26/1991
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 11/26/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 11/27/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/28/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 01/28/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 01/28/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/28/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 01/28/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 01/28/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/19/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/19/1992
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 02/19/1992
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 02/26/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 02/26/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/26/1992
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 03/04/1992
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 03/24/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/24/1992
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/07/1992
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 05/12/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/29/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 08/11/1992
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/09/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 09/14/1992
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 09/24/1992