Committees: H.R.2890 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/15/1991 Referred to
09/17/1992 Markup by
09/22/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-384 Part 2
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment09/09/1991 Referred to
07/31/1992 Hearings by
09/15/1992 Markup by
09/15/1992 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs07/15/1991 Referred to
11/13/1991 Markup by
11/25/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-384 Part 1
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care09/11/1991 Referred to
09/11/1991 Hearings by
10/02/1991 Markup by
10/02/1991 Reported by
Senate Finance10/08/1992 Referred to