Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 07/16/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 07/16/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 07/16/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/01/1991
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 08/01/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 08/01/1991
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 08/01/1991
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/01/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 08/01/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/17/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 09/17/1991
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 09/17/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/17/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/17/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/17/1991
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 09/24/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/23/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/23/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 10/29/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/05/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/12/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 11/12/1991
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 11/26/1991
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 02/27/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/20/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 03/20/1992