Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 07/16/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/17/1992
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/17/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/17/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/22/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/22/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/10/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 09/10/1992
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 10/05/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 10/05/1992