Committees: H.R.2929 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Interior and Insular Affairs07/17/1991 Referred to
10/16/1991 Markup by
11/04/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-283 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on General Oversight and California Desert Lands07/30/1991 Referred to
09/16/1991 Hearings by
10/01/1991 Markup by
10/01/1991 Reported by
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands10/11/1991 Referred to
10/16/1991 Discharged from
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries11/04/1991 Referred to
11/05/1991 Discharged from
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment11/05/1991 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/27/1991 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests11/28/1991 Referred to
04/30/1992 Hearings by