Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 07/17/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/17/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/22/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 07/22/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 08/02/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 08/02/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 08/02/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/02/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 08/02/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/02/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 08/02/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 08/02/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 08/02/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/02/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 08/02/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/02/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 08/02/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/02/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 08/02/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 08/02/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 08/02/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 08/02/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 08/02/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 08/02/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 08/02/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/02/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 08/02/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 08/02/1991
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 08/02/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 08/02/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 08/02/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 09/25/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 09/25/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/25/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/25/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 09/25/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 09/25/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/25/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 09/25/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/25/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/25/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/15/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 10/15/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 10/15/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 10/15/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 10/15/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/15/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/15/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/15/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/15/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/15/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/15/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 10/15/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/15/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/15/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/15/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 11/01/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 11/01/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/01/1991
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 11/01/1991
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 11/01/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 11/01/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/01/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 11/01/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 11/01/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/05/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 11/05/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/05/1991