Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 07/22/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 07/22/1991
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 07/22/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/23/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 08/02/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/02/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 08/02/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/11/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/11/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/11/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/11/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/11/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/11/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 09/11/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/11/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/11/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 09/11/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/11/1991
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/26/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/26/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 09/26/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/26/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/26/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/26/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/26/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/26/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/26/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 09/26/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 09/26/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 09/26/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/26/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 10/07/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/07/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/07/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 10/07/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 10/07/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/07/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/16/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 10/16/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/16/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/16/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 10/16/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 10/16/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 10/24/1991
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/24/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/24/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/24/1991
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 10/31/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/31/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/31/1991
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 10/31/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/31/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/31/1991
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 11/07/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 11/07/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/07/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/07/1991
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 11/07/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/07/1991
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/07/1991
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 11/14/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/14/1991
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 11/14/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 11/14/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 11/25/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 11/25/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 11/25/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 11/25/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 11/26/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 01/03/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/03/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 01/03/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/03/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 01/03/1992
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 01/03/1992
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 01/03/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 01/03/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/03/1992
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/03/1992
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/28/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 01/28/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 01/29/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/29/1992
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 01/29/1992
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 01/29/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/14/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 02/14/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/14/1992
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 02/14/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/14/1992
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/14/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/25/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 02/25/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/03/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/03/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/10/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/20/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/20/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 03/25/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/01/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/01/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/08/1992
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 04/08/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 04/08/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/08/1992
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 04/08/1992
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/09/1992
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 04/09/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/07/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/07/1992
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/13/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/13/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/13/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/20/1992
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/20/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 05/28/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/03/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 06/03/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/10/1992
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/22/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/08/1992
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 07/21/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 07/21/1992
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/28/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew