Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 01/03/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 01/03/1991
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 01/03/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 01/03/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10]* 01/03/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 01/10/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 01/10/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 03/05/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/05/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 03/05/1991
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 03/05/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/05/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/05/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 03/19/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/19/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 04/17/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 04/17/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/17/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 04/17/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/06/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 06/06/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/06/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 11/21/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/26/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/26/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/26/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 03/26/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/26/1992
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/26/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 03/26/1992