There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Trails System Act to designate the American Discovery Trail for study to determine the feasibility and desirability of its designation as a national trail.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/08/1992By Senator Johnston from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 102-463. Additional views filed.
10/07/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/24/1992Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/24/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
03/24/1992Reported by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 102-466.
07/24/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
10/08/1992HouseSee H.R.6184.
10/08/1992SenateBy Senator Johnston from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 102-463. Additional views filed.
10/08/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/07/1992SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/24/1992SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 731.
09/24/1992SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/22/1992SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/27/1992SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/26/1992SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/24/1992-1:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/24/1992-1:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
03/24/1992-1:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
03/24/1992-1:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
03/24/1992-1:09pmHouseMr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/24/1992HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 277.
03/24/1992HouseReported by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 102-466.
02/19/1992HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/19/1992HouseOrdered to be Reported.
02/06/1992HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
02/06/1992HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
11/18/1991HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
10/25/1991HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
07/30/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/24/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
07/24/1991HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs07/24/1991 Referred to
02/19/1992 Markup by
03/24/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-466
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands07/30/1991 Referred to
11/18/1991 Hearings by
02/06/1992 Markup by
02/06/1992 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/26/1992 Referred to
09/22/1992 Markup by
09/24/1992 Reported by S.Rept 102-463
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests03/27/1992 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (20)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3011. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/07/1992)

Amends the National Trails System Act to designate the American Discovery Trail extending from Pt. Reyes, California, through Nevada, Utah, Colorado, Kansas, Nebraska, Missouri, Iowa, Illinois, Indiana, Ohio, West Virginia, the District of Columbia, and Maryland to Cape Henlopen State Park, Delaware, and the Ala Kahakai Trail in Hawaii for study for potential addition to the National Trails System.