Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 07/25/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40]* 07/25/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/29/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/29/1991
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 10/29/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 10/29/1991
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 10/29/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/29/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 10/29/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 10/29/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/29/1991
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/29/1991
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/29/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/29/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 10/29/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 10/29/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 10/29/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/29/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 10/29/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 10/29/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/29/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/29/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/29/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/29/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/29/1991
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 10/29/1991
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/14/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/14/1991
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/14/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 11/14/1991
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 11/14/1991
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/14/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 11/14/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 11/14/1991
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 11/14/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 11/14/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 11/23/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 11/23/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 11/23/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/23/1991
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 11/23/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 11/23/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 11/27/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 02/26/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/26/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/26/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 03/31/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 03/31/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/31/1992
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/31/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/13/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/13/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/13/1992
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/13/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 05/13/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/13/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/11/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/11/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/11/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 09/17/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 09/17/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew