Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 07/29/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 09/24/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 09/24/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 10/15/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/30/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/30/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/30/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/30/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/30/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/30/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/30/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/30/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 10/30/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 10/30/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 10/30/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/30/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 10/30/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/30/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/30/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 11/19/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/19/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/19/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/19/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 11/19/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 01/28/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/28/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 01/28/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/25/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 03/25/1992
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/25/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/02/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/02/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/02/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/02/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/02/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/02/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/07/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 04/07/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 04/07/1992
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 04/07/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/07/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/29/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 05/07/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/12/1992