There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

All-Americans Savings and Investment Incentive Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for individuals a capital gains preference based on the period the asset is held and to allow individuals to exclude certain amounts of interest from gross income.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/31/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/31/1991Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/31/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (92)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/31/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 07/31/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/12/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/12/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/12/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 09/12/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/12/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/12/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/12/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 09/12/1991
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 09/12/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 09/12/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 09/12/1991
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/12/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 09/12/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 09/12/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 10/01/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 10/01/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 10/01/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 10/01/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 10/01/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 10/01/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/01/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 10/01/1991
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/01/1991
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/01/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/08/1991
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/08/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/22/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 10/22/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 10/22/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/22/1991
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 10/22/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 10/22/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 11/06/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 11/06/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 11/06/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/27/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 11/27/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 02/11/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/31/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3128. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/31/1991)

All-Americans Savings and Investment Incentive Act of 1991 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide individuals a deduction for capital gains based on the period the asset is held (up to three years). Excludes collectibles from such assets. Makes such deduction an item of tax preferences.

Excludes from gross income interest received during a taxable year up to $350 ($700 in the case of a joint return). Provides a phaseout of such exclusion for incomes over $50,000. Makes such exclusion applicable to distributions from regulated investment companies and real estate investment trusts. Makes certain nonresident aliens ineligible for such exclusion.