There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Police Corps and Law Enforcement Training and Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide educational assistance to law enforcement personnel and to increase the number of police officers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/01/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/23/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/01/1991Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/01/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 08/01/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 08/01/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 08/01/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 08/01/1991
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/11/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/11/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/11/1991
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 09/11/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/11/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/11/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/11/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/11/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/11/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/12/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 09/12/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 09/12/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/12/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/23/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/23/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/23/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 09/24/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/24/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 09/24/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 10/03/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 10/16/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/16/1991

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary08/01/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice04/23/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3172.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3172. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/01/1991)

Police Corps and Law Enforcement Training and Education Act - Establishes within the Department of Justice (DOJ) an Office of the Police Corps and Law Enforcement Education to be headed by a Director.

Requires a State that desires to participate in the Police Corps program to designate a lead agency and submit a State plan containing assurances with respect to: (1) lead agency cooperation with other State and local agencies; (2) the State advertising of the assistance available; (3) State screening and selection of law enforcement personnel for participation in the program; and (4) compliance with other specified requirements.

Authorizes the Director to award college scholarships (including direct payments to institutions and reimbursement of educational costs) to participants who agree to work for four years in a State or local police force after completion of a baccalaureate program and police corps training, subject to specified conditions. Sets forth provisions with respect to: (1) scholarship assistance for dependent children of law enforcement officers killed in the line of duty; (2) the selection of participants; (3) minority recruitment; and (4) leaves of absence.

Requires the Director to establish programs to provide basic law enforcement training to State Police Corps program participants. Authorizes such programs to be carried out: (1) at up to three training centers established and administered by the Director; or (2) by contracting with existing State training facilities.

Requires participants to attend two eight-week training sessions at such training centers and to meet certain performance standards in order to remain in the Police Corps program. Requires the Director to pay participants a weekly stipend during training.

Provides for the swearing in of participants as members of the police force to which they are assigned after completing Federal training and meeting the requirements of that police force. Authorizes the Director, upon a showing of good cause, to permit a participant to complete the service obligation in an equivalent alternative law enforcement service, if the police force of which the participant is a member subjects the participant to discipline which would preclude completion of four years of service on that force.

Requires a State, in order to participate in the Police Corps program, to submit a plan for implementing such program to the Director for approval. Requires such plan to: (1) include assurances that participants will receive effective training and leadership; (2) provide that program participants shall be assigned to community and preventive patrol in geographic areas with the greatest need for additional law enforcement personnel; and (3) prohibit participant assignment to any local police force whose size has declined by a specified portion or which has members who have been laid off but not retired.

Requires the Director to report annually on the Police Corps program to the Attorney General, the President, and specified congressional officials.

Authorizes appropriations.