Committees: H.R.3204 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce08/02/1991 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Competitiveness08/30/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary08/02/1991 Referred to
08/11/1992 Markup by
09/17/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-873 Part 1
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Intellectual Property and Judicial Administration08/13/1991 Referred to
02/19/1992 Hearings by
07/31/1992 Markup by
07/31/1992 Reported by
House Ways and Means08/02/1991 Referred to
09/16/1992 Markup by
09/21/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-873 Part 2
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade08/02/1991 Referred to
09/10/1992 Markup by
09/10/1992 Reported by