Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 10/03/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/03/1991
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/03/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/03/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 10/10/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/17/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 11/04/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/30/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 01/30/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 01/30/1992
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/30/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 01/30/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 01/30/1992