Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 08/02/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/16/1991
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 09/16/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/16/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 09/25/1991
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 09/25/1991
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/25/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/25/1991
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 09/25/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 09/25/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 09/25/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 09/25/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/25/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/25/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 09/25/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 09/25/1991
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 09/25/1991
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 09/25/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 09/25/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/25/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 09/25/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 09/25/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 09/25/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 09/25/1991
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/25/1991
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 09/25/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/25/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/25/1991
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 09/25/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 09/25/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 09/25/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/25/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/25/1991
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/25/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/25/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 09/25/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/25/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/25/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/25/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/25/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 09/25/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 09/25/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/26/1991
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 09/26/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/26/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/01/1991
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 10/01/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/01/1991
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 10/01/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 10/01/1991
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/01/1991
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 10/01/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 10/01/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/01/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/01/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 10/01/1991
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 10/01/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/01/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/01/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 10/09/1991
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/09/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 10/09/1991
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/09/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 10/09/1991
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 10/30/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/21/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 11/21/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 11/21/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 11/21/1991
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 01/28/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 03/03/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 03/03/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/01/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/01/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 04/01/1992
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/01/1992
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 09/15/1992