Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/11/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 01/11/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 01/11/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/11/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/11/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 01/11/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 01/11/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 01/11/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 01/11/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 01/11/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/11/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/11/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/11/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 01/11/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 01/11/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/11/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 01/11/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 01/11/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 01/11/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/11/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 01/16/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 01/16/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 01/16/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 01/16/1991
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 01/16/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 01/16/1991
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/16/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/16/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 01/16/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 01/16/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/16/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 01/16/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/16/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 01/16/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 01/16/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 01/29/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 01/29/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/29/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 01/29/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 01/29/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 01/29/1991
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 01/29/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/29/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/29/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 01/29/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/28/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/28/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/28/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/28/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/28/1991
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 02/28/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/28/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 03/07/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/07/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/07/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/22/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/22/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/07/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/07/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/07/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/11/1991
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/11/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 07/31/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 11/06/1991