There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Air and Space Museum Expansion Site Selection Act of 1992

Short Titles as Introduced

National Air and Space Museum Expansion Site Selection Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the National Air and Space Museum Expansion Site Advisory Panel for the purpose of developing a national competition for the evaluation of possible expansion sites for the National Air and Space Museum, and to authorize the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution to select, plan, and design such site.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/30/1992Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 106 - 317 (Roll No. 444).
09/28/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 102-923. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
08/02/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date
09/30/1992-6:01pmOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 106 - 317 (Roll No. 444).
Action By: House of Representatives
09/30/1992-5:42pmConsidered as unfinished business.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/1992-1:31pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Sept. 30.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/1992-12:48pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/1992-12:48pmConsidered under suspension of the rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/1992-12:47pmMr. Frost moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/1992Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 525.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/28/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 102-923. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
09/28/1992Mr. Natcher asked unanimous consent that the Committee on House Administration have until midnight on Sept. 28 to file a report on H.R. 3281. Agreed to without objection.
09/23/1992Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/23/1992Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/23/1991Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials
10/23/1991Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials
10/01/1991Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials
08/02/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
08/02/1991Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 08/02/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/12/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/12/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 09/24/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/01/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/03/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/15/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/22/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 10/29/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 10/30/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/05/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/19/1992
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 02/26/1992
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/27/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/16/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/19/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/25/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 06/09/1992
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/07/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration08/02/1991 Referred to
09/23/1992 Markup by
09/28/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-923
House Administration Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials08/02/1991 Referred to
10/01/1991 Hearings by
10/23/1991 Markup by
10/23/1991 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3281. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (09/28/1992)

National Air and Space Museum Expansion Site Selection Act of 1992 - Establishes a panel to recommend to the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution an expansion site for the National Air and Space Museum, which shall: (1) be known as the National Air and Space Museum Expansion Site Advisory Panel; and (2) complete its work within one year.

Directs the Panel, as part of the recommendation process, to: (1) obtain proposals for expansion sites in a nationwide competition; and (2) develop and promulgate criteria for site evaluation, including long-term costs, access to operational runway facilities, ready accessibility to the public, and other administrative and curatorial factors related to the storage, management, and display of the Smithsonian Institution's collection of aircraft and spacecraft (but excluding the proximity to the District of Columbia (D.C.), except that administrative and curatorial advantages of a site in the D.C. region may be included).

Requires the Panel to submit to the Congress and the Board a report that evaluates each proposal submitted to the panel in light of such criteria and contains a single recommendation of an expansion site.

Sets forth administrative provisions. Authorizes appropriations.

Directs the Board to select an expansion site based on: (1) the criteria developed by the Panel; and (2) the recommendation of the expansion site submitted by the Panel.

Authorizes the Board to conduct planning and design activities with respect to such expansion site only to the extent that amounts for such activities are made available in appropriations Acts enacted after this Act.