Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 08/02/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 08/02/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 08/02/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/12/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/12/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 09/24/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/01/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/03/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/15/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/22/1991
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 10/29/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 10/30/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/05/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/19/1992
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 02/26/1992
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/27/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/16/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/19/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/25/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 06/09/1992
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/07/1992