Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 09/25/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 09/25/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/25/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 09/25/1991
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/25/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 09/25/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/25/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/25/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 09/25/1991
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 09/25/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/25/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/25/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 09/30/1991
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/30/1991
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 09/30/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/30/1991
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/30/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 09/30/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/30/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/30/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 09/30/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 09/30/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 09/30/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/30/1991
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 09/30/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/30/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/30/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 09/30/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/30/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/30/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 09/30/1991
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/30/1991
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/30/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/30/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/03/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 10/03/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 10/03/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/03/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 10/03/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/03/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 10/03/1991
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/03/1991
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 10/03/1991
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 10/03/1991
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/03/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/03/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 10/03/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/03/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 10/03/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 10/03/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 10/03/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/03/1991
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/03/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 10/03/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 10/03/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/03/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 10/03/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/09/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 10/09/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/09/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 10/09/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 10/09/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 10/09/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 10/09/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/09/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 10/09/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 10/09/1991
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 10/09/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 10/09/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/09/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 10/09/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 10/09/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/09/1991
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/09/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/09/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/09/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/09/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/09/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/24/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/24/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/24/1991
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 10/24/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/24/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/24/1991
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 10/24/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 10/24/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 10/24/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 10/24/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/24/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/24/1991
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 10/24/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/24/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 10/24/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/24/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 10/24/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/24/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 10/24/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 10/24/1991
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 10/24/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 10/24/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/24/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/24/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 10/24/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 10/24/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/24/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 10/24/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 11/08/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/08/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 11/08/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 11/08/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 11/08/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 11/08/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/08/1991
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 11/08/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 11/08/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 11/08/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/08/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 11/08/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/08/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/20/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 11/20/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 11/20/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/20/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 11/20/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 11/20/1991
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 11/20/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 11/22/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/22/1991