There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Baltic Nations Assistance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To declare that Lithuania, Latvia, and Estonia shall be eligible for assistance under United States assistance programs for Eastern Europe.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/11/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/25/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
09/11/1991Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20]* 09/11/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 09/16/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 09/16/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/16/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 09/16/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 09/16/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/16/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/16/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 09/16/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 09/16/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/16/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/16/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/23/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/23/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/23/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 09/23/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 09/23/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/23/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 09/23/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 09/23/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/23/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 09/23/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/23/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/01/1991
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/01/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/01/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 11/01/1991
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 11/01/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/01/1991
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 11/01/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/01/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/01/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 11/01/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 11/01/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 11/01/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 11/01/1991

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs09/11/1991 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East09/25/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3296.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3296. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/11/1991)

Baltic Nations Assistance Act - Considers Lithuania, Latvia, and Estonia to be eligible East European countries for purposes of any program of assistance for Eastern Europe.