Text: H.R.3296 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House

 
 
HR 3296 IH
102d CONGRESS
1st Session
 H. R. 3296
To declare that Lithuania, Latvia, and Estonia shall be eligible for assistance
under United States assistance programs for Eastern Europe.
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
September 11, 1991
Mr. BROOMFIELD (for himself and Mr. DURBIN) introduced the following bill;
which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs
A BILL
To declare that Lithuania, Latvia, and Estonia shall be eligible for assistance
under United States assistance programs for Eastern Europe.
  Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United
  States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.
  This Act may be cited as the `Baltic Nations Assistance Act'.
SEC. 2. FINDINGS.
  The Congress finds that--
  (1) Lithuania, Latvia, and Estonia are separate nations in Europe with
  distinct territorial, cultural, and historical features;
  (2) the United States recognized the independent nations of Lithuania,
  Latvia, and Estonia on July 26, 1922;
  (3) the United States has never recognized the forced annexation of
  Lithuania, Latvia, and Estonia into the Soviet Union;
  (4) Lithuania reaffirmed its independence from the Soviet Union on March
  11, 1991, and Latvia and Estonia reaffirmed their independence from the
  Soviet Union on August 21, 1991;
  (5) the United States reaffirmed its recognition of the independent nations
  of Lithuania, Latvia, and Estonia on September 2, 1991;
  (6) the Soviet Union recognized the independence of Lithuania, Latvia,
  and Estonia on September 6, 1991;
  (7) the Soviet occupation of Lithuanian, Latvian, and Estonian territory
  has led to widespread economic and environmental problems; and
  (8) United States assistance programs for Eastern Europe are designed to
  respond to circumstances similar to those in the Baltic nations.
SEC. 3. ELIGIBILITY OF BALTIC NATIONS FOR UNITED STATES ASSISTANCE.
  Lithuania, Latvia, and Estonia shall be considered to be eligible East
  European countries for purposes of any program of assistance for Eastern
  Europe carried out pursuant to the Support for East European Democracy
  (SEED) Act of 1989, the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961, or any other Act.