There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Disaster Victim Assistance Act of 1991

Short Titles as Introduced

Disaster Victim Assistance Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To preserve the disaster loan fund to assist victims of future disasters, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
05/15/1992Committee on Rules discharged.
05/15/1992Committee on Government Operations discharged.
03/26/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 102-471, Part I. of those committees pursuant to clause 1(j) and (q), rule
09/11/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date
05/15/1992Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 309.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/1992Committee on Rules discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/15/1992Committee on Government Operations discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/1992House Committee on Government Operations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 15, 1992.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/08/1992House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 15, 1992.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/1992House Committee on Government Operations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 8, 1992.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/1992House Committee on Rules Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 8, 1992.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/16/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
03/26/1992Referred jointly and sequentially to the House Committee on Rules for a period ending not later than April 17, 1992 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee pursuant to clause 1(q).
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/1992Referred jointly and sequentially to the House Committee on Government Operations for a period ending not later than April 17, 1992 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee pursuant to clause 1(j).
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 102-471, Part I. of those committees pursuant to clause 1(j) and (q), rule
Action By: Committee on Small Business
03/11/1992Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
03/11/1992Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Small Business
03/05/1992Subcommittee on SBA, the General Economy, and Minority Enterprise Developme Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
03/05/1992Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
10/10/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on SBA, the General Economy, and Minority Enterprise Development.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
09/11/1991Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/11/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business09/11/1991 Referred to
03/05/1992 Hearings by
03/11/1992 Markup by
03/26/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-471 Part 1
House Small Business Subcommittee on SBA, the General Economy and Minority Enterprise Development10/10/1991 Referred to
03/05/1992 Discharged from
House Government Operations03/26/1992 Referred to
05/15/1992 Discharged from
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security04/16/1992 Referred to
House Rules03/26/1992 Referred to
05/15/1992 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3304.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3304. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (03/26/1992)

Disaster Victim Assistance Act of 1991 - Amends the Small Business Act to make disaster loan repayment collections credited to a liquidating account available to assist disaster victims beyond October 1, 1991. Declares that to the extent that monies in approved appropriations originate solely from collections of principal and interest on prior disaster loans, such monies shall not be included in the amount of Federal budget authority or outlays for purposes of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act), as amended by the Budget Enforcement Act of 1990 (thus precluding such monies from being counted for Federal budget purposes).