Text: H.R.3304 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House

 
 
Union Calendar No. 309
102d CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 3304
[Report No. 102-471, Part I]
A BILL
To preserve the disaster loan fund to assist victims of future disasters,
and for other purposes.
May 15, 1992
Committees on Government Operations and Rules discharged; committed to
the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, and ordered to
be printed
HR 3304 RH
Union Calendar No. 309
102d CONGRESS
2d Session
 H. R. 3304
[Report No. 102-471, Part I]
To preserve the disaster loan fund to assist victims of future disasters,
and for other purposes.
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
September 11, 1991
Mr. LAFALCE (for himself and Mr. IRELAND) introduced the following bill;
which was referred to the Committee on Small Business
March 26, 1992
Reported with an amendment and referred to the Committees on Government
Operations and Rules for a period ending not later than April 17, 1992,
for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall
within the jurisdiction of those committees pursuant to clause 1 (j) and
(q), rule X, respectively
[Strike out all after the enacting clause and insert the part printed
in italic]
April 17, 1992
Referral to the Committees on Government Operations and Rules extended for
a period ending not later than May 8, 1992
May 8, 1992
Referral to the Committees on Government Operations and Rules extended for
a period ending not later than May 15, 1992
May 15, 1992
Additional sponsors: Mr. SMITH of Iowa, Mr. SKELTON, Mr. MAZZOLI,
Mr. MAVROULES, Mr. HATCHER, Mr. WYDEN, Mr. OLIN, Mr. LANCASTER, Mr. BROOMFIELD,
Mr. COMBEST, Mr. FRANKS of Connecticut, Mr. CAMP, Mr. RAMSTAD, and Mr. Boehner
May 15, 1992
Committees on Government Operations and Rules discharged; committed to
the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union, and ordered to
be printed
[For text of introduced bill, see copy of bill as introduced on September
11, 1991]
A BILL
To preserve the disaster loan fund to assist victims of future disasters,
and for other purposes.
  Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United
  States of America in Congress assembled,
That this Act may be cited as the `Disaster Victim Assistance Act of 1991'.
  SEC. 2. Section 4(c)(3) of the Small Business Act is amended to read
  as follows:
 `(3) Notwithstanding any law, rule or regulation, collections resulting
 from disaster loans which are credited to a liquidating account of the
 Administration (A) shall remain available subsequent to October 1, 1991 for
 disaster activities, including salaries and expenses in such amounts as may
 be necessary, subject to amounts approved in advance in appropriations Acts,
 to the same extent and in the same manner that monies were made available
 prior to such date and (B) may be transferred, in whole or in part, to the
 general fund of the Treasury only to the extent and in such amounts as are
 provided in advance in appropriations Acts. Notwithstanding any other law,
 to the extent that monies approved in appropriations Acts originate solely
 from collections of principal and interest on prior disaster loans, they
 shall not be included in the amount of budget authority or outlays of the
 Federal Government for purposes of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit
 Control Act of 1985, as amended, or the Budget Enforcement Act of 1990.'.