Text: H.R.3314 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House

 
 
HR 3314 IH
102d CONGRESS
1st Session
 H. R. 3314
To extend nondiscriminatory (most-favored-nation) treatment to Estonia,
Latvia, and Lithuania.
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
September 12, 1991
Mr. HOYER (for himself, Mr. DURBIN, Mr. FEIGHAN, Mr. RITTER, Ms. SLAUGHTER
of New York, Mr. SKAGGS, Mr. WELDON, Mr. JONES of Georgia, Mr. LAUGHLIN,
Mr. KLECZKA, Mr. SOLARZ, Mr. GALLO, Mr. HORTON, Mr. KYL, Mr. PENNY,
Mr. BROOMFIELD, Mr. COX of Illinois, Mr. MOAKLEY, Mr. ENGEL, Mr. HOBSON,
Mr. LENT, Mrs. MEYERS of Kansas, Mr. BILBRAY, Mr. SARPALIUS, Mr. GORDON,
Mrs. MORELLA, Mr. PALLONE, Mr. VISCLOSKY, Ms. NORTON, Mr. LEVIN of Michigan,
Mr. MCNULTY, Mr. HENRY, Mr. ECKART, Mr. MARTINEZ, Mr. FAWELL, Mr. EDWARDS of
California, Mr. TORRES, Mr. FOGLIETTA, Mr. SMITH of Florida, and Mr. SCHEUER),
introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways
and Means
A BILL
To extend nondiscriminatory (most-favored-nation) treatment to Estonia,
Latvia, and Lithuania.
  Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United
  States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. FINDINGS.
  The Congress finds the following:
  (1) The Government of the United States entered into treaties extending
  most-favored-nation treatment with the Government of Estonia on August 1,
  1925, the Government of Latvia on April 30, 1926, and the Government of
  Lithuania on July 10, 1926, and those treaties are considered to be still
  in force.
  (2) In 1951, in order to prevent the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics from
  exploiting the preferential trade status of Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania,
  the authorized representatives of Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania authorized
  a temporary suspension of most-favored-nation status for the products of
  those states.
  (3) The Agreement on Trade Relations between the United States and the
  Union of Soviet Socialist Republics, signed on June 1, 1990, does not
  apply to Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania.
  (4) On September 2, 1991, the United States extended full diplomatic
  recognition to Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania and other nations, including
  the Soviet Union, have also recognized the independence of the Baltic States.
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF MOST-FAVORED-NATION STATUS TO PRODUCTS OF THE BALTIC
COUNTRIES.
  (a) IN GENERAL- Notwithstanding any other provision of law, nondiscriminatory
  treatment (most-favored-nation treatment) shall apply to the products of
  Estonia, Latvia, and Lithuania.
  (b) CONSEQUENTIAL AMENDMENT TO TARIFF SCHEDULE- General Note 3(b) of the
  Harmonized Tariff Schedule of the United States is amended by striking out
  `Estonia', `Latvia', and `Lithuania'.