Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 09/17/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 11/06/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 11/06/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 11/06/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/06/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 11/06/1991
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 11/06/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 11/06/1991
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 11/06/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 11/06/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/06/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/06/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 11/06/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 11/06/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 11/06/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/06/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 11/06/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/06/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 11/06/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 11/06/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/07/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 11/18/1991
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 11/18/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/18/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/18/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/18/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/26/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 11/26/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 01/03/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/07/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/07/1992
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/07/1992
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 03/05/1992
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 03/09/1992
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/09/1992
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/09/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/26/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/26/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/26/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/26/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/26/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/26/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 04/01/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/01/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/01/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/01/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/01/1992
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/09/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/09/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/29/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/29/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/29/1992
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 05/19/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/19/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/19/1992
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 05/19/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/19/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/19/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/19/1992
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 05/19/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/05/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/05/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/05/1992
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/05/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/05/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 06/05/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 06/05/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/05/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/05/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/05/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 06/05/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 06/18/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/18/1992
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/18/1992
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/18/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/18/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 06/18/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 06/18/1992
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/18/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/18/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 06/18/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/18/1992
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/18/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/18/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 06/18/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 06/18/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/18/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/18/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/25/1992
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/25/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/25/1992
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/25/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/01/1992
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/01/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 07/01/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/09/1992
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/22/1992