There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Silvio O. Conte Disabilities Prevention Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Silvio O. Conte Disabilities Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish a program for the prevention of disabilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/28/1991Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/24/1991Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 102-271.
09/24/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
11/20/1991SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Disability Policy.
Action By: Committee on Labor and Human Resources
11/12/1991SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
10/29/1991SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/28/1991-12:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/28/1991-12:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/28/1991-12:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/28/1991-12:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
10/28/1991-12:26pmHouseMr. Waxman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/24/1991HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 162.
10/24/1991HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 102-271.
10/08/1991HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/08/1991HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
10/02/1991HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment
10/02/1991HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment
10/01/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/24/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/24/1991HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 10/08/1991

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/24/1991 Referred to
10/08/1991 Markup by
10/24/1991 Reported by H.Rept 102-271
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment10/01/1991 Referred to
10/02/1991 Markup by
10/02/1991 Reported by
Senate Labor and Human Resources11/12/1991 Referred to
Senate Labor and Human Resources Subcommittee on Disability Policy11/20/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3401.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3401. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/28/1991)

Silvio O. Conte Disabilities Prevention Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize grants and contracts for the prevention of disabilities and the prevention of secondary conditions resulting from disabilities, including through demonstrations and interventions, surveillances and studies, public education, and training health professionals. Authorizes appropriations.