Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 10/01/1991
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/08/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/17/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 10/22/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/22/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 10/23/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/25/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 11/26/1991
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 02/05/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 02/07/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 02/19/1992
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 02/26/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/27/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 03/05/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/17/1992
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/31/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/31/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 04/02/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/07/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/07/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 04/28/1992
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 05/18/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/04/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 06/04/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 06/11/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/16/1992
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/24/1992
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/01/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 07/02/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 07/21/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/21/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/10/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 08/10/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/10/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 08/12/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/12/1992
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 09/10/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew