Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 10/01/1991
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 10/22/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/22/1991
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 10/23/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/25/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 11/26/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 01/28/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 02/05/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 02/19/1992
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 04/02/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 04/02/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/07/1992
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 05/18/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/04/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 06/11/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/16/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew