Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/10/1991
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 10/10/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/10/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/10/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/10/1991
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 10/22/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/30/1991
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 11/06/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 11/06/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 11/12/1991
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 11/21/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/02/1992
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/28/1992