Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/27/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/27/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/27/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/28/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/18/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/18/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 03/18/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/18/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/14/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/10/1992