There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Qualified Medicare Beneficiary Enrollment Improvement and Protection Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to include a description of the medical assistance for medicare cost-sharing available under title XIX of such Act in the annual program notices sent to medicare beneficiaries, to amend title XIX of such Act to require States to make applications for such assistance available at local offices of the Social Security Administration and to accept such applications by mail, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/02/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
10/18/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/07/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
10/02/1991Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/02/1991Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/02/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 10/02/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 10/02/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 10/02/1991
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 10/02/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/08/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/08/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/08/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/08/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/08/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/22/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/22/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/22/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 10/22/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 10/28/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/28/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/28/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 10/28/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/28/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 10/28/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/06/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/06/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/06/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 11/06/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 11/06/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 11/06/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/14/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 11/14/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/14/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 11/14/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 11/14/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/19/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/19/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 11/22/1991
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 11/22/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 11/22/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 01/29/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/19/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/19/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/19/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/11/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/11/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/25/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/25/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/25/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/01/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/03/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/03/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/09/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/02/1991 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment10/18/1991 Referred to
House Ways and Means10/02/1991 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health10/07/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3473.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3473. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/02/1991)

Qualified Medicare Beneficiary Enrollment Improvement and Protection Act of 1991 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to include in the annual mailing to Medicare beneficiaries: (1) a clear and simple explanation of the availability of and the requirements to qualify for Medicaid (title XIX of the Social Security Act) payment of their premiums, deductibles, and copayments under Medicare; (2) the toll-free telephone number to be established by the Secretary for information on such assistance; and (3) an initial application for such assistance.

Directs the Secretary to develop a poster containing the information listed above and distribute it to service providers in order to publicize the availability of such assistance.

Amends the Medicaid program to direct the Secretary to: (1) establish a process for using local Social Security Administration offices for the distribution and receipt of applications for such assistance; (2) transmit such applications to the appropriate State agency; (3) develop a form to be available at such offices which individuals may use to request additional information on or an application for such assistance; and (4) distribute such form to entities receiving grants for programs to provide services to older individuals.

Requires States to provide for a process for receiving, distributing, and processing applications for such assistance and for responding to requests for information on or applications for such assistance.

Allows individuals who qualified during a certain period for Medicaid payment of Medicare costs to temporarily apply for retroactive payment of any medical costs incurred but not paid under a State plan required to provide for making Medicaid payment of Medicare costs available to Medicare beneficiaries.

Allows States, in determining the income level for individuals who seek to qualify for Medicaid payment of Medicare costs, to exclude expenses for medical care incurred by the individual that are not reimbursed under a public program of the State or political subdivision thereof, a health plan, or Medicare.

Directs the Secretary to establish a grant program to provide outreach services to enable individuals who are entitled to receive Medicaid payment of Medicare costs to receive such assistance. Authorizes appropriations.