Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 10/17/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 10/17/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 10/17/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/17/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 10/17/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/17/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 10/17/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/17/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/24/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/24/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/24/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/24/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 11/07/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/07/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 11/20/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 03/10/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/10/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/10/1992
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/10/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/10/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/10/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/10/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/10/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/07/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/07/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/07/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 05/12/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/29/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 06/29/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 06/29/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/23/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 07/23/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/23/1992
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/23/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/23/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/23/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/23/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 07/28/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/28/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/28/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/28/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/28/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 07/28/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/28/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/28/1992
Rep. Colordao, Antonio [D-PR-At Large] 08/05/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/05/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/05/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/05/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 08/05/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/18/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/18/1992
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/18/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/18/1992