Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 10/03/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/29/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/29/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/29/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/29/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 11/27/1991
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/27/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 11/27/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/27/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/25/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/26/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/28/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/05/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 07/02/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 07/02/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 07/29/1992