Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 10/08/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 10/08/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17]* 10/08/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 10/08/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 10/08/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/08/1991
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 10/08/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/22/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/22/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/22/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 10/22/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/22/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/22/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 11/06/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 11/06/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/06/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 11/06/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 11/06/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 01/28/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/19/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 04/09/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/28/1992
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/28/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/21/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/30/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/31/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 10/01/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/01/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/01/1992