There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Civil Tiltrotor Development Advisory Committee Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Transportation to establish a Civil Tiltrotor Development Advisory Committee in the Department of Transportation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/27/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
07/27/1992Reported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 102-725.
10/09/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
07/28/1992SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
07/27/1992-2:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/27/1992-2:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
07/27/1992-1:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/27/1992-1:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
07/27/1992-1:58pmHouseMr. Oberstar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/27/1992HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 416.
07/27/1992HouseReported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 102-725.
07/01/1992HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
07/01/1992HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
06/25/1992HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Aviation
06/25/1992HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Aviation
10/21/1991HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
10/09/1991HouseReferred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
10/09/1991HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation10/09/1991 Referred to
07/01/1992 Markup by
07/27/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-725
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Aviation10/21/1991 Referred to
06/25/1992 Markup by
06/25/1992 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/28/1992 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3537. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/09/1991)

Civil Tiltrotor Development Advisory Committee Act of 1991 - Directs the Secretary of Transportation to establish in the Department of Transportation a Civil Tiltrotor Development Advisory Committee to evaluate and report to the Congress on the feasibility of developing civil tiltrotor aircraft and a national system of infrastructure to support the incorporation of tiltrotor aircraft technology into the national transportation system.