Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 10/10/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 01/03/1992
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 01/03/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 01/03/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/03/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 01/03/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 01/03/1992
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/28/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/28/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 01/28/1992
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 01/28/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 01/28/1992
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 01/28/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 01/29/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 01/29/1992
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 01/29/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/29/1992
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/29/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 01/29/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 01/29/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 02/05/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/05/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/05/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/05/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/05/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/05/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 02/05/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 02/05/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/20/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/20/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/20/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/20/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/20/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/03/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 03/03/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/03/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/11/1992