Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/14/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/14/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/14/1991
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/14/1991
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/14/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/14/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 11/14/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/14/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/14/1991
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/14/1991
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 11/14/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 11/14/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/14/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 11/14/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/22/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/22/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/22/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 11/22/1991
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 11/22/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 11/22/1991
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/05/1992
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/05/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/05/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/05/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 02/05/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/26/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 02/26/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/26/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/26/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 02/26/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 02/26/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/28/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/28/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/28/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 04/28/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/14/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/14/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/14/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 05/14/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 05/14/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 05/20/1992
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/20/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/16/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/16/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 06/22/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 06/22/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 06/22/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/22/1992
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 06/22/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/22/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/22/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/22/1992
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/22/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/22/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 06/22/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/26/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/26/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 06/26/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/01/1992
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/01/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/02/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 07/02/1992
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 07/09/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 07/09/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 08/05/1992
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 08/06/1992
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 08/12/1992
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 09/24/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/24/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/30/1992