Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Rostenkowski, Dan [D-IL-8]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 10/21/1991
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 10/22/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 10/22/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/22/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 10/22/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/22/1991
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/22/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/22/1991
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/22/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 10/23/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 10/23/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 10/23/1991
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 10/23/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/23/1991
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/23/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/23/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/23/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 10/23/1991
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/23/1991
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 10/23/1991
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 10/23/1991
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 10/23/1991
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 10/23/1991
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/23/1991
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 10/23/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/23/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/23/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/23/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 10/23/1991
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 10/24/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/24/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 10/24/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 10/24/1991
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 10/24/1991
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/24/1991
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 10/24/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/24/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 10/24/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 10/24/1991
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/24/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 10/29/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/29/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 10/29/1991
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 10/29/1991
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/29/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/29/1991
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 10/29/1991
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/29/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 10/29/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 10/29/1991
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 10/29/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/29/1991
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1] 10/29/1991
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/29/1991
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 10/29/1991
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/29/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 10/29/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/29/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/30/1991
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 10/30/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 10/30/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/30/1991
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 10/30/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/30/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 10/30/1991
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 10/30/1991
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/30/1991
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/30/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/30/1991
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/31/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 10/31/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 10/31/1991
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/31/1991
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 10/31/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/31/1991
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/31/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 11/04/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/04/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/04/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 11/04/1991
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 11/04/1991
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 11/04/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/04/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/04/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 11/04/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 11/04/1991
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 11/04/1991
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/04/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 11/04/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 11/04/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 11/04/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 11/04/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 11/04/1991
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 11/04/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 11/04/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 11/04/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 11/06/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/06/1991
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 11/06/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 11/06/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/06/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 11/06/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/08/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 11/08/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 11/08/1991
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 11/08/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 11/08/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 11/08/1991
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/08/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 11/08/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 11/12/1991
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 11/12/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 11/12/1991
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 11/12/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/12/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/12/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/12/1991