Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 10/22/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 10/22/1991
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 10/22/1991
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 10/22/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/22/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 10/22/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 10/22/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/19/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/19/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/19/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/19/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 02/19/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/19/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/19/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/19/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/07/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/07/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/07/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/07/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/07/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/07/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/07/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 04/07/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 04/07/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/07/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/07/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/07/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/07/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/07/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 04/09/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/09/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/09/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/06/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/06/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/06/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/06/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/06/1992
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 05/06/1992
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 05/06/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/11/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/11/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/11/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/11/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/11/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/11/1992
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/11/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/11/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/11/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 06/11/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/11/1992