Committees: H.R.3665 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs10/30/1991 Referred to
03/25/1992 Markup by
04/07/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-482
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands11/18/1991 Referred to
11/18/1991 Hearings by
03/19/1992 Markup by
03/19/1992 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources04/10/1992 Referred to
09/22/1992 Markup by
09/24/1992 Reported by S.Rept 102-472
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests04/13/1992 Referred to
08/06/1992 Hearings by