Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 11/21/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 11/21/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 11/21/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 11/21/1991
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 11/21/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 11/21/1991
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 11/21/1991
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 11/26/1991
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 11/26/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/26/1991
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 11/26/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 11/26/1991
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/26/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 01/29/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/29/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 01/29/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 01/29/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 01/29/1992
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 01/29/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/29/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 01/29/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 01/29/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 01/29/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 01/29/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 01/29/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/29/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 01/29/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 01/29/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/29/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 02/27/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/27/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 02/27/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/27/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 02/27/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/27/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/27/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/27/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/09/1992
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 04/09/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/17/1992
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/17/1992