Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16]* 11/12/1991
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 11/12/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/12/1991
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 11/12/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 11/12/1991
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 11/13/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 11/13/1991
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 11/13/1991
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 11/13/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 11/13/1991
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 11/14/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/14/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/14/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/18/1991
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/18/1991
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/18/1991
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/19/1991
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 11/19/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 11/19/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 11/21/1991
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 11/25/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/25/1991